Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Jean-Baptiste Durand de Missy

Deceased

Bishop of Avranches


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1692¹BornRouen
17 Apr 174654.2SelectedBishop of Avranches, France
19 Sep 174654.7ConfirmedBishop of Avranches, France
9 Oct 174654.7Ordained BishopBishop of Avranches, France
4 Apr 176472.2DiedBishop of Avranches, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Jean-Baptiste Durand de Missy:
Bishop Pierre-Jean-Baptiste Durand de Missy (died ) Bishop of Avranches

  • a bishop for 17.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015