Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacio Arbulú Pineda

Deceased

Bishop of Huánuco


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Feb 1909BornCaraz
26 May 193829.3Ordained PriestPriest
6 Feb 195950.0AppointedBishop of Huánuco, Peru
12 Apr 195950.1Ordained BishopBishop of Huánuco, Peru
6 Apr 197970.1DiedBishop of Huánuco, Peru

MicroData Summary for Ignacio Arbulú Pineda:
Bishop Ignacio Arbulú Pineda (born , died ) Bishop of Huánuco

  • a priest for 40.8 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 31
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 210, Number 17,412

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015