Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louie Patalinghug Galbines

Bishop of Kabankalan, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Nov 1966 Born
29 Apr 199427.4Ordained PriestPriest of Bacolod, Philippines
12 Mar 201851.3AppointedBishop of Kabankalan, Philippines
28 May 201851.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kabankalan, Philippines
29 May 201851.5InstalledBishop of Kabankalan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Louie Patalinghug Galbines (VIAF: 291165347)
Bishop Louie Patalinghug Galbines (born ) Bishop of Kabankalan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAliwanag, Sagay, Negros Occidental, Diocese of Bacolod
Ordained BishopSan Sebastian, Cathedral, Bacolod, Diocese of Bacolod

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kabankalan.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Mar 2018
  • ob/i: CB, 17 Mar 2018
  • c2: CB, 24 May 2018
  • c34: CB, 28 May 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 28 May 2018

Quantcast