Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Lazzarotto

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Israel

Titular Archbishop of Numana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1942 Born
1 Apr 196724.8Ordained PriestPriest of Padova {Padua}, Italy
23 Jul 199452.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Numana
23 Jul 199452.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Jordan
23 Jul 199452.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Iraq
7 Oct 199452.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Numana
11 Nov 200058.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Ireland
22 Dec 200765.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Australia
18 Aug 201270.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Israel
18 Aug 201270.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Jerusalem and Palestine
30 Aug 201270.2AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Cyprus
28 Aug 201775.2RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Israel
28 Aug 201775.2RetiredApostolic Delegate to Jerusalem and Palestine
28 Aug 201775.2RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Cyprus

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Lazzarotto
Archbishop Giuseppe Lazzarotto (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Israel

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarpané di San Nazario, Italy
Ordained BishopCathedral, Padova, Diocese of Padova {Padua}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Israel.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,442
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Aug 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Aug 2012
  • r: CB, 28 Aug 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 29 Aug 2017