Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Denis Brennan

Bishop of Ferns, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jun 1945 Born
31 May 197024.9Ordained PriestPriest of Ferns, Ireland
1 Mar 200660.6AppointedBishop of Ferns, Ireland
23 Apr 200660.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ferns, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Denis Brennan
Bishop Denis Brennan (born ) Bishop of Ferns

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpringmount, Ratnure

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ferns.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2006
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast