Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Boleslaw Cardinal Filipiak

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of San Giovanni Bosco in via Tuscolana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1901Born
29 May 192624.7Ordained PriestPriest of Gniezno e Poznań, Poland
Jun 196765.7AppointedDean of the Roman Rota
1 May 197674.6AppointedTitular Archbishop of Plestia
14 May 197674.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Plestia
24 May 197674.7AppointedCardinal-Deacon of San Giovanni Bosco in via Tuscolana
24 May 197674.7Elevated to Cardinal
14 Oct 197877.1DiedCardinal-Deacon of San Giovanni Bosco in via Tuscolana

MicroData Summary for Boleslaw Filipiak
Boleslaw Cardinal Filipiak (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of San Giovanni Bosco in via Tuscolana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOsniszczewko

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 2.4 years
  • a cardinal for 2.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • tarc: CB, 22 Jan 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast