Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolfo Ramón Canecín

Bishop of Goya, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1958 Born
17 Dec 198628.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Formosa, Argentina
25 Mar 198830.0Ordained PriestPriest of Formosa, Argentina
9 Dec 201456.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Goya, Argentina
25 Mar 201557.0Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Goya, Argentina
24 Sep 201557.4SucceededBishop of Goya, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Adolfo Ramón Canecín
Bishop Adolfo Ramón Canecín (born ) Bishop of Goya

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFormosa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Goya.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2014
  • ob: CB, 15 Dec 2014
  • c2+: CB, 6 Feb 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,395
  • s: Bollettino, 24 Sep 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018