Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop József Lányi de Késmark

Deceased

Bishop of Knin (Tinin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jun 1868BornNémetpróna
2 Jul 189123.0Ordained PriestPriest of Banská Bystrica, Slovakia
16 Nov 190638.3AppointedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
8 Dec 190638.4Ordained BishopBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia
28 Sep 193163.2DiedBishop of Knin (Tinin), Croatia

MicroData Summary for József Lányi de Késmark:
Bishop József Lányi de Késmark (born , died ) Bishop of Knin (Tinin)

  • a priest for 40.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1932
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 369
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 75

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 10 Jun 2015