Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Istvan Miklósy

Deceased

Bishop of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1857Born
17 Apr 188426.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mukachevo (Munkács) (Ruthenian), Ukraine
23 Jun 191355.8AppointedBishop of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary
5 Oct 191356.1Ordained BishopBishop of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary
29 Oct 193780.1DiedBishop of Hajdúdorog (Hungarian), Hungary

MicroData Summary for Istvan Miklósy (VIAF: 316482302)
Bishop Istvan Miklósy (born , died ) Bishop of Hajdúdorog

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRákóczi
Death PlaceNyiregyházá

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 24.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1913, Number 58
  • opd/c1: CB, 8 Jun 2016
  • bp/dp: CB, 7 Dec 2017
  • bp/dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast