Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Beatus Christian Urassa, ALCP/OSS

Bishop of Sumbawanga, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Aug 1965 Born
12 Jul 199731.9Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Spiritus Sancti
19 Apr 201852.7AppointedBishop of Sumbawanga, Tanzania
24 Jun 201852.8Ordained BishopBishop of Sumbawanga, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Beatus Christian Urassa
Bishop Beatus Christian Urassa ALCP/OSS (born ) Bishop of Sumbawanga

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKeni Mashati Rombo, Diocese of Moshi
Ordained BishopOpen Air, near, Cathedral, Sumbawanga, Diocese of Sumbawanga

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Sumbawanga.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Apr 2018
  • ob: CB, 20 Apr 2018
  • c2: CB, 24 Jun 2018
  • c3: CB, 25 Jun 2018
  • c4: CB, 27 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 27 Jun 2018

Quantcast