Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Mbeya

Dioecesis Mbeyaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Evaristo Marc Chengula, I.M.C., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 25 March 1953
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Songea
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Tanzania, United Republic of
  • Square Kilometers: 60,348 (23,309 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 179, Mbeya, Tanzania
  • Telephone: 2502.250
  • Fax: 2504.170

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Tukuyu
18 July 1932ErectedMission "Sui Iuris" of Tukuyu (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Tukuyu
29 March 1938ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Tukuyu Prefecture Apostolic of Tukuyu
Vicariate Apostolic of Mbeya
14 July 1949ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Tukuyu Vicariate Apostolic of Mbeya
Diocese of Mbeya
25 March 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Mbeya Diocese of Mbeya
25 March 1972Territory LostDiocese of Dodoma
Diocese of Mbeya
Diocese of Mbulu
Archdiocese of Tabora
Diocese of Singida (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Mbeya
195020,517308,2406.7%4182293238ap1951
Diocese of Mbeya
197065,200775,0008.4%834421,552413215ap1971
198086,5111,107,7137.8%1033432,011376219ap1981
1990142,4821,315,44610.8%2826542,6382913621ap1991
1999204,7051,831,40811.2%4914633,2492014925ap2000
2000207,6991,888,18111.0%4715623,3492115226ap2001
2001239,2501,912,72712.5%5016663,6252116125ap2002
2002246,5001,972,02112.5%4414584,2501816027ap2003
2003263,5891,815,33214.5%4413574,6241717827ap2004
2004248,2381,867,97513.3%4710574,3551519428ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 5 May 2014