Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Herbert Armstrong Bevard

Bishop Emeritus of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1946 Born
Jun 196418.2Converted
20 May 197226.2Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
7 Jul 200862.3AppointedBishop of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA
3 Sep 200862.5Ordained BishopBishop of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA
18 Sep 202074.5ResignedBishop of Saint Thomas, American Virgin Islands, USA

MicroData Summary for Herbert Armstrong Bevard
Bishop Herbert Armstrong Bevard (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Saint Thomas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaltimore, MD
Ordained BishopSts. Peter and Paul, Cathedral, Charlotte Amalie

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Saint Thomas.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,953
  • r: Bollettino, 18 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast