Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Eric Stowe, O.F.M. Conv.

Bishop of Lexington, Kentucky


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1966 BornAmherst, OH
1 Aug 199226.2Solemn ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
16 Sep 199529.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
12 Mar 201548.9AppointedBishop of Lexington, Kentucky, USA
5 May 201549.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lexington, Kentucky, USA

MicroData Summary for John Eric Stowe:
Bishop John Eric Stowe O.F.M. Conv. (born ) Bishop of Lexington

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Lexington.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Mar 2015
  • c1/ob: CB, 12 Mar 2015
  • c2: CB, 24 Mar 2015
  • c34: CB, 18 Apr 2015
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 223, Number 18,491

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015