Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augusto Alves da Rocha

Bishop Emeritus of Floriano, Piaui


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jul 1933 BornBertolinia
21 Feb 196026.5Ordained PriestPriest
23 May 197541.8AppointedBishop of Picos, Piaui, Brazil
23 Aug 197542.0Ordained BishopBishop of Picos, Piaui, Brazil
24 Oct 200168.2AppointedBishop of Oeiras-Floriano, Piaui, Brazil
27 Feb 200874.6AppointedBishop of Floriano, Piaui, Brazil
18 May 200874.8InstalledBishop of Floriano, Piaui, Brazil
17 Mar 201076.6RetiredBishop of Floriano, Piaui, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Augusto Alves da Rocha:
Bishop Augusto Alves da Rocha (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Floriano

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Floriano.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 27 Feb 2008
  • r: Bollettino, 17 Mar 2010

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015