Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Stephan Burger

Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Apr 1962 BornFreiburg im Breisgau
20 May 199028.0Ordained PriestPriest of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
30 May 201452.0AppointedArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany
29 Jun 201452.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Stephan Burger:
Archbishop Stephan Burger (born ) Archbishop of Freiburg im Breisgau

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Freiburg im Breisgau.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 May 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 30 May 2014
  • c34: CB, 19 Jun 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015