Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop László Kerekes

Auxiliary Bishop of Alba Iulia, Romania

Titular Bishop of Tharros


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1968 Born
16 May 199324.8Ordained PriestPriest of Alba Iulia, Romania
26 May 202051.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Alba Iulia, Romania
26 May 202051.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Tharros
29 Aug 202052.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tharros

MicroData Summary for László Kerekes
Bishop László Kerekes (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Alba Iulia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKézdivásárhely (Târgu Secuiesc), Diocese of Alba Iulia
Ordained PriestChurch, Ghelinţa (Gelence), Archdiocese of Alba Iulia
Ordained BishopMarian Sanctuary, Șumuleu Ciuc (Csíksomlyó)

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Alba Iulia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 26 May 2020
  • ob: CB, 30 Jun 2020
  • c2+: CB, 6 Jul 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 29 Aug 2020

Quantcast