Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop György-Miklós Jakubínyi

Archbishop Emeritus of Alba Iulia, Romania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1946 Born
13 Apr 196923.1Ordained PriestPriest
14 Mar 199044.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Alba Iulia, Romania
14 Mar 199044.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae Regiae
29 Apr 199044.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae Regiae
199144.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Romania (Armenian)
8 Apr 199448.1AppointedArchbishop of Alba Iulia, Romania
24 Dec 201973.8ResignedArchbishop of Alba Iulia, Romania
2 Sep 202074.5ResignedApostolic Administrator of Romania (Armenian)

MicroData Summary for György-Miklós Jakubínyi (VIAF: 43535358)
Archbishop György-Miklós Jakubínyi (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Alba Iulia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSighetul-Marmatiei
Ordained BishopMarial, Shrine, Sumuleu (Csiksomlyo)

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Alba Iulia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 121, Number 10,873
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 24 Dec 2019
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Sep 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 2 Feb 2021

Quantcast