Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Keily

Deceased

Bishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1854Born
18 Mar 187722.7Ordained PriestPriest of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
21 Apr 191156.8AppointedBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
13 Jun 191156.9Ordained BishopBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain
23 Sep 192874.2DiedBishop of Plymouth, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Keily
Bishop John Joseph Keily (born , died ) Bishop of Plymouth

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLimerick, Ireland

  • a priest for 51.5 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1911, Number 51
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 134
  • dp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018