Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gebhard Fürst

Bishop Emeritus of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1948 Born
27 Mar 197728.3Ordained PriestPriest of Rottenburg, Germany
7 Jul 200051.5AppointedBishop of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany
17 Sep 200051.7Ordained BishopBishop of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany
4 Dec 202375.0RetiredBishop of Rottenburg-Stuttgart, Germany

MicroData Summary for Gebhard Fürst
(VIAF: 112038415; WikiData: Q69064)
Bishop Gebhard Fürst (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Rottenburg-Stuttgart

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBietigheim
Ordained BishopSaint Martin, Cathedral, Rottenburg, Diocese of Rottenburg-Stuttgart

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Rottenburg-Stuttgart.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,841
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Dec 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 4 Dec 2023