Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Paul Lontsié-Keuné

Bishop-Elect of Yokadouma, Cameroon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1963 Born
17 Mar 199127.5Ordained PriestPriest of Bafoussam, Cameroon
25 Apr 201753.6AppointedBishop of Yokadouma, Cameroon
5 Jul 201753.8Ordained BishopBishop of Yokadouma, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Paul Lontsié-Keuné
Father Paul Lontsié-Keuné (born ) Bishop-Elect of Yokadouma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBalatchi, Diocese of Bafoussam

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Yokadouma.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 Apr 2017
  • ob: CB, 3 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 May 2017