Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Simo

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bafoussam

Titular Bishop of Sereddeli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Mar 1937 BornBapa
27 Mar 196629.0Ordained PriestPriest of Bafoussam, Cameroon
26 Jan 198749.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Douala, Cameroon
26 Jan 198749.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Sereddeli
26 Apr 198750.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sereddeli
11 Nov 199457.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bafoussam, Cameroon
14 Sep 201376.4RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Bafoussam, Cameroon

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Simo:
Bishop Gabriel Simo (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Bafoussam

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Bafoussam.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015