Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Étienne-François-Xavier des Michels de Champorcin

Deceased

Bishop of Toul


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1721BornDigne
28 Apr 177149.6SelectedBishop of Senez, France
17 Jun 177149.7ConfirmedBishop of Senez, France
18 Aug 177149.9Ordained BishopBishop of Senez, France
28 Nov 177352.1SelectedBishop of Toul, France
25 Feb 177452.4ResignedBishop of Senez, France
18 Apr 177452.5ConfirmedBishop of Toul, France
19 Jul 180785.8DiedBishop of Toul, France

MicroData Summary for Étienne-François-Xavier des Michels de Champorcin:
Bishop Étienne-François-Xavier des Michels de Champorcin (born , died ) Bishop of Toul

  • a bishop for 35.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1771, Number 13
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 375, and Page 422

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 3 Jan 2016