Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis-François-Renaud de Villeneuve

Deceased

Bishop of Montpellier


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1683BornAix
29 Nov 172340.6SelectedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
12 Jun 172441.1ConfirmedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
13 Aug 172441.3Ordained BishopBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
Mar 1748³64.9SelectedBishop of Montpellier, France
12 Jul 174865.2ResignedBishop of Viviers (Aps), France
16 Sep 174865.4ConfirmedBishop of Montpellier, France
24 Jan 176682.8DiedBishop of Montpellier, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Louis-François-Renaud de Villeneuve:
Bishop Louis-François-Renaud de Villeneuve (born , died ) Bishop of Montpellier

  • a bishop for 41.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 417
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 296
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1724, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 17 Nov 2015