Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antoine-René Bardonnenche

Deceased

Bishop of Vence


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1721BornGrenoble
1 Nov 177150.3SelectedBishop of Vence, France
27 Jan 177250.6ConfirmedBishop of Vence, France
15 Mar 177250.7Ordained BishopBishop of Vence, France
6 Oct 178362.3DiedBishop of Vence, France

MicroData Summary for Antoine-René Bardonnenche:
Bishop Antoine-René Bardonnenche (born , died ) Bishop of Vence

  • a bishop for 11.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1772, Number 6
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 435

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 30 Dec 2015