Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Bellucci

Deceased

Bishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1832Born
22 Sep 185523.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
22 Dec 185523.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jul 188552.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
30 Dec 188957.3AppointedBishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy
6 Jan 189057.3Ordained BishopBishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy
19 Feb 191784.4DiedBishop of Chiusi e Pienza, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Bellucci
Bishop Giacomo Bellucci (born , died ) Bishop of Chiusi e Pienza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceScanzano, Diocese of Sovana e Pitigliano
Ordained BishopSt. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a priest for 61.1 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1919
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 212, and Page 523
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1890, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 May 2017