Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Edoardo Cardinal Borromeo

Deceased

Titular Archbishop of Adana

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede

Prefect of the Congregation of the Reverend Fabric of St. Peter

Archpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Aug 1822Born
Dec 1846³24.3Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 186845.6Elevated to Cardinal
16 Mar 186845.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Santi Vito, Modesto e Crescenzia
10 Jul 187249.9AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di San Pietro in Vaticano {Saint Peter Basilica}
10 Jul 187249.9AppointedPrefect of the Congregation of the Reverend Fabric of St. Peter
28 Mar 187855.6AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Prassede
19 Apr 187855.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Adana
19 May 187855.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Adana
30 Nov 188159.3DiedTitular Archbishop of Adana

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Edoardo Borromeo (VIAF: 252930958)
Edoardo Cardinal Borromeo (born , died ) Titular Archbishop of Adana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}, Italy
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Original)Temporary Tomb, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Buried Place (Current)Vatican Chapter Chapel, Campo Verano, Cemetery, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 34.9 years
  • a bishop for 3.5 years
  • a cardinal for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 74, and Page 52
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 55
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1878, Number 24
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 13 Mar 1868

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017