Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenzo Petris de Dolammare

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Sapė, Albania

Titular Bishop of Esbus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jan 1835Born
7 Jan 188954.0AppointedBishop of Pult, Albania
17 Feb 188954.1Ordained BishopBishop of Pult, Albania
5 Aug 189055.5AppointedBishop of Sapė, Albania
12 Jun 189257.4ResignedBishop of Sapė, Albania
21 Jan 189358.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Esbus
3 Sep 191075.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Sapė, Albania

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Petris de Dolammare
Bishop Lorenzo Petris de Dolammare (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Sapė

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCherso d'Istria
Ordained BishopSt. Apollinaire, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 263, and Page 472
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 501
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1889, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 May 2017