Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Karl Moser

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

Titular Bishop of Absorus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1914Born
30 Oct 193824.8Ordained PriestPriest of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
9 Jul 196955.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria
9 Jul 196955.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Absorus
12 Oct 196955.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Absorus
27 Sep 199177.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}, Austria

MicroData Summary for Karl Moser
Bishop Karl Moser (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Wien {Vienna}

EventPlace
Birth PlacePörthof/Stein
Ordained BishopSankt Stefan, Cathedral, Wien, Archdiocese of Wien {Vienna}

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 6, Number 272

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast