Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Friedrich Helmel, S.V.D. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Guarapuava, Parana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 May 1911BornLunz am See, Austria
31 Oct 193726.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of the Divine Word
19 Mar 196654.9AppointedBishop of Guarapuava, Parana, Brazil
19 May 196655.0Ordained BishopBishop of Guarapuava, Parana, Brazil
27 Sep 198675.4RetiredBishop of Guarapuava, Parana, Brazil
12 Sep 199382.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Guarapuava, Parana, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Helmel:
Bishop Friedrich Helmel S.V.D. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Guarapuava

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 174, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013