Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Severo Araújo y Silva

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela

Titular Bishop of Temnus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Mar 1846BornRianjo
Dec 1871³25.7Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
8 Jun 190660.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain
8 Jun 190660.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Temnus
14 Oct 190660.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Temnus
6 Aug 191064.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela, Spain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Severo Araújo y Silva:
Bishop Severo Araújo y Silva (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 3.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013