Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santiago Ozcoidi y Udave

Deceased

Bishop of Tarazona (-Tudela), Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Dec 1850Born
14 Dec 190554.9AppointedBishop of Tarazona (-Tudela), Spain
11 Jun 190756.4Ordained BishopBishop of Tarazona (-Tudela), Spain
Jul 190756.5InstalledBishop of Tarazona (-Tudela), Spain
9 Oct 191665.7DiedBishop of Tarazona (-Tudela), Spain

MicroData Summary for Santiago Ozcoidi y Udave
Bishop Santiago Ozcoidi y Udave (born , died ) Bishop of Tarazona (-Tudela)

EventPlace
Birth PlacePamplona, Diocese of Pamplona
Ordained BishopCathedral, Vitoria, Diocese of Vitoria

  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1907, Number 31
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 370
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 74, Number 5,906
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 75, Number 6,006

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast