Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Felipe Joaquín Oláiz y Zabalza, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Guam, Pacific (Oceania)

Titular Bishop of Docimium


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jun 1872Born
29 Jan 189623.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
20 Jul 191442.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of Guam, Pacific (Oceania)
20 Jul 191442.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Docimium
30 Nov 191442.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Docimium
1 Jan 193360.5ResignedVicar Apostolic of Guam, Pacific (Oceania)
8 Dec 194573.5DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Guam, Pacific (Oceania)

MicroData Summary for Felipe Joaquín Oláiz y Zabalza
Bishop Felipe Joaquín Oláiz y Zabalza O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Guam

EventPlace
Birth PlacePamplona, Spain

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 31.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 67

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast