Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Lloyd Hogan

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rochester, New York


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1916BornLima, NY
6 Jun 194226.2Ordained PriestPriest of Rochester, New York, USA
6 Oct 196953.5AppointedBishop of Rochester, New York, USA
28 Nov 196953.7Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, New York, USA
22 Nov 197862.6ResignedBishop of Rochester, New York, USA
27 Aug 200084.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Rochester, New York, USA

MicroData Summary for Joseph Lloyd Hogan:
Bishop Joseph Lloyd Hogan (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rochester

  • a priest for 58.2 years
  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015