Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lawrence Bernard Brennan Casey

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Paterson, New Jersey, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1905Born
7 Jun 193024.7Ordained PriestPriest of Rochester, New York, USA
10 Feb 195347.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rochester, New York, USA
10 Feb 195347.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cea
5 May 195347.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cea
4 Mar 196660.4AppointedBishop of Paterson, New Jersey, USA
13 Jun 197771.7ResignedBishop of Paterson, New Jersey, USA
15 Jun 197771.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Paterson, New Jersey, USA

MicroData Summary for Lawrence Bernard Brennan Casey
Bishop Lawrence Bernard Brennan Casey (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Paterson

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRochester, NY

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 20 Feb 2018