Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Arabia

Apostolicus Vicariatus Arabiae Meridionalis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Paul Hinder, O.F.M. Cap., Vicar Apostolic
  • Giovanni Bernardo Gremoli, O.F.M. Cap., Vicar Apostolic Emeritus

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Vicariate Apostolic
  • Name Changed: 31 May 2011
  • Vicariate
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Yemen
  • Square Kilometers: 3,182,122 (1,229,094 Square Miles)
  • Description: Oman, UAE, and Yemen
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 54, Abu Dhabi, United Arab Emirates
  • Telephone: (02)4461.895
  • Fax: 4465.177

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Aden
4 May 1888ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Aden (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Arabia
28 June 1889Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Aden Vicariate Apostolic of Arabia
29 June 1953Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Arabia Prefecture Apostolic of Kuwait (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Arabia
31 May 2011Name ChangedVicariate Apostolic of Arabia Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Arabia

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Arabia
19505,84010,000,000.1%9964854ap1951
19708,22212,864,230.1%11314587133411ap1971
1980132,80018,000,000.7%419235,773227015ap1981
1990500,00023,750,0002.1%7202718,518206518ap1991
19991,000,00036,200,0002.8%8273528,5711277020ap2000
20001,300,00042,250,0003.1%9273636,1113276520ap2001
20011,400,00042,250,0003.3%8293737,8373296519ap2002
20021,300,00042,500,0003.1%9314032,5003316821ap2003
20031,300,00047,760,0002.7%8344230,9522346421ap2004
20041,300,50047,760,6692.7%9364528,9001366420ap2005
20102,129,00062,498,2403.4%9566532,7531566223ap2011
Vicariate Apostolic of Southern Arabia
20121,695,91463,694,4792.7%10617123,8861616220ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 1 Jul 2013