Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonius Hofmann

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Passau


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1909BornRinchnach
13 Apr 193626.5Ordained PriestPriest of Passau, Germany
20 Sep 196152.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Passau, Germany
20 Sep 196152.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Berenice
26 Nov 196152.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Berenice
27 Oct 196859.1SucceededBishop of Passau, Germany
15 Oct 198475.0RetiredBishop of Passau, Germany
11 Mar 200090.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Antonius Hofmann:
Bishop Antonius Hofmann (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Passau

  • a priest for 63.9 years
  • a bishop for 38.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013