Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Valentin Heimes

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Worms

Titular Bishop of Aulon

Auxiliary Bishop of Mainz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Mar 1741BornHattenheim
19 Mar 176322.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mainz, Germany
22 Sep 176423.5Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
20 Mar 178039.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Worms, Germany
20 Mar 178039.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Aulon
16 Apr 178039.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aulon
18 Jul 178342.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
23 Jul 180665.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Worms, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Valentin Heimes:
Bishop Johann Valentin Heimes (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Worms

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1780, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 107, and Page 453

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 1 Jan 2016