Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthias Starck

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mainz

Titular Bishop of Coronea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1628BornLottstetten
19 Mar 165526.2Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
2 Jun 168152.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
2 Jun 168152.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Coronea
27 Jul 168152.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coronea
27 Mar 170273.2ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Mainz, Germany
8 Feb 170879.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Matthias Starck:
Bishop Matthias Starck (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Mainz

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 26.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 173
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 44

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 1 May 2015