Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emmerich Joseph von Breidbach zu Bürresheim

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz, Germany

Bishop of Worms


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1707Born
6 Jan 173628.1Ordained DeaconDeacon of Mainz, Germany
5 Oct 175850.8Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
5 Jul 176355.6SelectedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
22 Aug 176355.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
13 Nov 176356.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
1 Mar 176860.3SelectedBishop of Worms, Germany
16 May 176860.5ConfirmedBishop of Worms, Germany
11 Jun 177466.5DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Emmerich Joseph von Breidbach zu Bürresheim
Archbishop Emmerich Joseph von Breidbach zu Bürresheim (born , died ) Archbishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKoblenz

  • a priest for 15.6 years
  • a bishop for 10.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1763, Number 30
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 292, and Page 447

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast