Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lothar Franz von Schönborn

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz, Germany

Bishop of Bamberg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Oct 1655Born
16 Nov 169338.1SelectedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
4 Jan 169438.2ConfirmedBishop of Bamberg, Germany
3 Sep 169438.9SelectedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mainz, Germany
11 Oct 169439.0ConfirmedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mainz, Germany
30 Mar 169539.4SucceededArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
30 Oct 169540.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
1 Nov 169540.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Nov 169540.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
30 Jan 172973.3DiedBishop of Bamberg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Lothar Franz von Schönborn (VIAF: 15056893)
Archbishop Lothar Franz von Schönborn (born , died ) Archbishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSteinheim
Ordained DeaconLoreto Chapel, Capuchin, Church, Mainz, Archdiocese of Mainz
Ordained PriestLoreto Chapel, Capuchin, Church, Mainz, Archdiocese of Mainz
Ordained BishopMainz, Archdiocese of Mainz

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 113, and Page 272
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,695, Number 27
  • b/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Number 18,605
  • b/c2+: ATh
  • od/c01/loc: CB, 16 Jun 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast