Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Friedrich Karl Joseph von Erthal

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mainz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1719³BornMainz
12 Jul 174526.5Ordained DeaconDeacon
18 Jul 177455.5SelectedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
26 Jul 177455.5SelectedBishop of Worms, Germany
11 Sep 177455.6Ordained PriestPriest
13 Mar 177556.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
13 Mar 177556.1ConfirmedBishop of Worms, Germany
14 May 177556.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
4 Jul 180283.5ResignedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
4 Jul 180283.5ResignedBishop of Worms, Germany
25 Jul 180283.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mainz, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Friedrich Karl Joseph von Erthal:
Archbishop Friedrich Karl Joseph von Erthal (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mainz

  • a priest for 27.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1775, Number 15
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 292, and Page 447

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 1 Jan 2016