Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Heinrich von Anethan

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

Titular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1618¹BornTrier
6 Jul 166547.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Hildesheim, Germany
6 Jul 166547.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
21 Sep 166547.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Isauria
13 Nov 167658.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
6 Feb 168062.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
18 Jun 169375.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Johann Heinrich von Anethan:
Bishop Johann Heinrich von Anethan (born 1618, died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a bishop for 27.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 203
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 220
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1665, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 17 Apr 2015