Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Franz Georg von Schönborn

Deceased

Archbishop of Trier, Germany

Bishop of Worms


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Jun 1682Born
11 May 171734.9Ordained DeaconDeacon
2 May 172946.8SelectedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
7 Sep 172947.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Trier, Germany
18 Oct 172947.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Oct 172947.3Ordained BishopArchbishop of Trier, Germany
2 Feb 173047.6InstalledArchbishop of Trier, Germany
17 Jun 173250.0SelectedBishop of Worms, Germany
11 Aug 173250.1ConfirmedBishop of Worms, Germany
18 Jan 175673.5DiedArchbishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Franz Georg von Schönborn
Archbishop Franz Georg von Schönborn (born , died ) Archbishop of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMainz

  • a priest for 26.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 387
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 446
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1729, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast