Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anselm Franz von Ingelheim

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1634Born
15 May 166025.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mainz, Germany
7 Nov 167945.1SelectedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
11 Mar 168045.5ConfirmedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
1 May 168045.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
30 Mar 169560.5DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

MicroData Summary for Anselm Franz von Ingelheim
Archbishop Anselm Franz von Ingelheim (born , died ) Archbishop of Mainz

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKöln

  • a priest for 34.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 271
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1680, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast