Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas Smith

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Bolina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1763Born
Jun 1787³24.1Ordained PriestPriest of Northern District, England, Great Britain
15 May 180744.1AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
15 May 180744.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Bolina
10 Mar 181046.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bolina
2 Jun 182158.1SucceededVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain
30 Jul 183168.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Thomas Smith
Bishop Thomas Smith (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrooms, Consett, County Durham, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained PriestEnglish, College, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained BishopSt. Edmund's, College, Ware, Hertfordshire, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Death PlaceUshaw, College, Durham, County Durham, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Buried Place (Original)Ushaw, College, Durham, County Durham, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England

  • a priest for 44.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1810, Number 2
  • ob/c2+/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,538
  • bd/op/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 114
  • b/c1: Arundel to Zabi, Page 186
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018
  • bp: CL, 22 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 27 Jan 2018