Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Charles-Marie de Beauvais

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Senez


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1731BornCherbourg
26 Dec 177342.0SelectedBishop of Senez, France
28 Feb 177442.2ConfirmedBishop of Senez, France
20 Mar 177442.2Ordained BishopBishop of Senez, France
20 Jun 178452.5ResignedBishop of Senez, France
4 Apr 179058.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Senez, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste-Charles-Marie de Beauvais
Bishop Jean-Baptiste-Charles-Marie de Beauvais (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Senez

  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1774, Number 10
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 375

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Feb 2016