Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Joseph Lausberg

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

Titular Bishop of Thyatira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1852BornHöngen
22 May 187522.5Ordained DeaconDeacon of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
21 Nov 187523.0Ordained PriestPriest of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
1 May 191461.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
1 May 191461.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thyatira
29 Jun 191461.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thyatira
30 Sep 192269.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany

MicroData Summary for Peter Joseph Lausberg:
Bishop Peter Joseph Lausberg (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Köln {Cologne}

  • a priest for 46.9 years
  • a bishop for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 37
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 368

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013