Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Theodor Kappenberg

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

Titular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Jul 1848Born
10 Aug 187325.0Ordained PriestPriest of Münster, Germany
27 Apr 191465.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany
27 Apr 191465.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto
24 May 191465.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sozopolis in Haemimonto
18 Sep 192072.1DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Münster, Germany

MicroData Summary for Theodor Kappenberg
Bishop Theodor Kappenberg (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Münster

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNordkirchen

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 26
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 348

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018