Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Costantino Mazzieri, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Ndola, Zambia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Mar 1889Born
23 Apr 190516.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
15 Aug 190920.3Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
31 Mar 191223.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
10 Aug 191223.3Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
4 Feb 193848.8AppointedPrefect of Ndola, Zambia
24 Apr 193849.0InstalledPrefect of Ndola, Zambia
13 Jan 194959.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Coeliana
13 Jan 194959.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ndola, Zambia
13 Feb 194959.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Coeliana
25 Apr 195970.0AppointedBishop of Ndola, Zambia
2 Aug 195970.3InstalledBishop of Ndola, Zambia
26 Nov 196576.6RetiredBishop of Ndola, Zambia
26 Nov 196576.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Casae Nigrae
14 Dec 197081.7ResignedTitular Bishop of Casae Nigrae
19 Aug 198394.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Ndola, Zambia

MicroData Summary for Francesco Costantino Mazzieri (VIAF: 100748114)
Bishop Francesco Costantino Mazzieri O.F.M. Conv. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Ndola

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbbadia di Osimo, Diocese of Osimo e Cingoli, Italy
Ordained DeaconSan Francesco, Church, San Miniato, Diocese of San Miniato, Italy
Ordained PriestSantissimo Crocifisso, Church, San Miniato, Diocese of San Miniato, Italy
Ordained BishopSanti XII Apostoli, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy
Death PlaceMissione di Santa Teresa, Ibenga, Diocese of Ndola
Buried Place (Original)Missione di Santa Teresa, Cemetery, Ibenga, Diocese of Ndola

  • a priest for 71.0 years
  • a bishop for 34.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 9
  • prof/c01/loc: AM, 19 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast