Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Edward Rudderham

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Clifton, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1899BornNorwich
31 Oct 192627.4Ordained PriestPriest of Northampton, England, Great Britain
14 May 194949.9AppointedBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain
26 Jul 194950.1Ordained BishopBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain
31 Aug 197475.2RetiredBishop of Clifton, England, Great Britain
24 Feb 197979.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Clifton, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Joseph Edward Rudderham:
Bishop Joseph Edward Rudderham (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Clifton

  • a priest for 52.3 years
  • a bishop for 29.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 62

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013